AR SB446 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Notification that SB446 is now Act 699
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning Step Therapy Requirements For Certain Prescription Drugs To Treat Metastatic Cancer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning Step Therapy Requirements For Certain Prescription Drugs To Treat Metastatic Cancer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05SenateNotification that SB446 is now Act 699
2019-04-02SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-02SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-01SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-01SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-01SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-01SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2019-04-01SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-28SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2019-03-26SenateRe-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-03-26SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2019-03-26HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-03-26HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-20HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-20HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-20HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-19HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-04HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-04HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-04SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-28SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-26SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-02-26SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback