AR SB445 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Notification that SB445 is now Act 545
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Notification that SB445 is now Act 545
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide For A March Primary Election On Years In Which The Office Of President Of The United States Will Be Voted On; And To Amend The Time For The General Assembly To Meet In Fiscal Session.
Title
To Provide For A March Primary Election On Years In Which The Office Of President Of The United States Will Be Voted On; And To Amend The Time For The General Assembly To Meet In Fiscal Session.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 74 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Sounding of the Ballot (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Sounding of the Ballot (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Notification that SB445 is now Act 545 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-03-19 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-19 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-13 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-03-07 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Sounding of the Ballot |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed |