AR SB444 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Notification that SB444 is now Act 757
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Community Based Program And Radiation Therapy Services Grants General Improvement Appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Community Based Program And Radiation Therapy Services Grants General Improvement Appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-31SenateNotification that SB444 is now Act 757
2015-03-25SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2015-03-25SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2015-03-24SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2015-03-24SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2015-03-24HouseReturned To Senate as Passed.
2015-03-24HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-03-24HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-03-24HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2015-03-24HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2015-03-23HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2015-03-23HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2015-03-23SenateOrdered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2015-03-23SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-03-23SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-03-19SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2015-02-18SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2015-02-18SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback