AR SB441 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Notification that SB441 is now Act 646
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Sales And Use Tax Laws Concerning Exemptions Related To Certain Machinery And Equipment; And To Allow A Sales And Use Tax Exemption For Certain Machinery And Equipment Placed In Inventory.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Sales And Use Tax Laws Concerning Exemptions Related To Certain Machinery And Equipment; And To Allow A Sales And Use Tax Exemption For Certain Machinery And Equipment Placed In Inventory.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-11SenateNotification that SB441 is now Act 646
2023-04-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2023-04-06SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2023-04-05SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2023-04-05SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2023-04-05HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2023-04-05HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-04-04HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-04-03HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2023-04-03HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2023-04-03SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2023-04-03SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-04-03SenateRules suspended.
2023-04-03SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-03-16SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2023-03-16SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback