AR SB441 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB441 is now Act 928
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB441 is now Act 928
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Add Restrictions Regarding Advertising Of Medical Marijuana And Use Of Certain Symbols.
Title
To Add Restrictions Regarding Advertising Of Medical Marijuana And Use Of Certain Symbols.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Notification that SB441 is now Act 928 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Re-referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2019-04-02 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2019-04-02 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-28 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-28 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-28 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-27 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-03-19 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2019-03-19 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed |