AR SB437 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Notification that SB437 is now Act 483
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Arkansas Minority Health Commission For The Minority Health Initiative Of The Targeted State Needs Program Supplemental Appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Arkansas Minority Health Commission For The Minority Health Initiative Of The Targeted State Needs Program Supplemental Appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateNotification that SB437 is now Act 483
2019-03-13SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-13SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-12SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-12SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-12HouseReturned To Senate as Passed.
2019-03-12HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-12HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-12HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2019-03-12HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2019-03-06HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2019-03-06HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-06SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-06SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-06SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-05SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-26SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-02-26SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback