AR SB432 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Notification that SB432 is now Act 1068
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Notification that SB432 is now Act 1068
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Change The Population Ratio To Sell Vinous, Spirituous, Or Malt Liquor Off-premises.
Title
To Change The Population Ratio To Sell Vinous, Spirituous, Or Malt Liquor Off-premises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | Senate | Notification that SB432 is now Act 1068 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2013-03-06 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Filed |