AR SB429 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Notification that SB429 is now Act 771
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Arkansas Economic Development Commission - Capital Improvement Projects, Grants And Programs Appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Arkansas Economic Development Commission - Capital Improvement Projects, Grants And Programs Appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 41 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateNotification that SB429 is now Act 771
2019-04-04SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-04SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-03SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-03SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-04-03HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-04-03HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-04-03HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-26HouseRead the third time and failed.
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2019-03-26HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2019-03-25HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2019-03-25HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-25SenateOrdered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-25SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-25SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-19SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-19SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-14SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-02-26SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-02-26SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback