AR SB423 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Senate Notification that SB423 is now Act 751
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Regarding Substances In Schedule I And Schedule Vi And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding Substances In Schedule I And Schedule Vi And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-28 Senate Notification that SB423 is now Act 751
2011-03-24 Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2011-03-24 Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2011-03-23 Senate ORDERED ENROLLED
2011-03-23 Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2011-03-23 Senate Read the third time and passed.
2011-03-23 Senate Rules suspended.
2011-03-23 Senate House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2011-03-10 Senate Returned From the House as passed as amended.
2011-03-10 House Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2011-03-10 House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2011-03-10 House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2011-03-09 House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2011-03-09 House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2011-03-09 House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2011-03-08 House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2011-03-02 House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2011-03-02 House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2011-03-02 Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
2011-03-02 Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2011-03-02 Senate Read the third time and passed.
2011-02-28 Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2011-02-24 Senate Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2011-02-24 Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2011-02-24 Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2011-02-24 Senate Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2011-02-22 Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2011-02-22 Senate Filed

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback