AR SB420 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Notification that SB420 is now Act 688
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Notification that SB420 is now Act 688
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow Insurance Carriers To Obtain Practitioner And Dispenser Information Maintained By The Prescription Drug Monitoring Program; And To Allow Prescriber Data To Be Used For Research Purposes.
Title
To Allow Insurance Carriers To Obtain Practitioner And Dispenser Information Maintained By The Prescription Drug Monitoring Program; And To Allow Prescriber Data To Be Used For Research Purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Notification that SB420 is now Act 688 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-21 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-16 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-06 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Filed |