AR SB415 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Notification that SB415 is now Act 349
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Education - Capital Improvement Appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Education - Capital Improvement Appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateNotification that SB415 is now Act 349
2019-03-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-06SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-05SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-05SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-05HouseReturned To Senate as Passed.
2019-03-05HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-05HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-05HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2019-03-05HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2019-03-04HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2019-03-04HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-04SenateOrdered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-04SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-28SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-26SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-02-26SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback