AR SB409 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Notification that SB409 is now Act 1075
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Notification that SB409 is now Act 1075
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow For The Electronic Notification Of An Invitation For Bids And Electronic Submission Of Bids; And To Create The Fair Notice And Efficiency In Public Works Act.
Title
To Allow For The Electronic Notification Of An Invitation For Bids And Electronic Submission Of Bids; And To Create The Fair Notice And Efficiency In Public Works Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Notification that SB409 is now Act 1075 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-04-10 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2019-04-10 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-04-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-04-08 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-04-08 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-04-03 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed |