AR SB409 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Notification that SB409 is now Act 1075
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Allow For The Electronic Notification Of An Invitation For Bids And Electronic Submission Of Bids; And To Create The Fair Notice And Efficiency In Public Works Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Allow For The Electronic Notification Of An Invitation For Bids And Electronic Submission Of Bids; And To Create The Fair Notice And Efficiency In Public Works Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateNotification that SB409 is now Act 1075
2019-04-15SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-15SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-10SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-10SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-04-10HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-04-10HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-09HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-04-08HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-04-08HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-04-08SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-04-08SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-08SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-08SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-04-08SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-04-08SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-08SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-08SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-08SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-05SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-05SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-05SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-05SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-05SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
2019-04-05SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-04-04SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-04-03SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-04-03SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-03SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-03SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-04-03SenateRules suspended.
2019-02-26SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-02-26SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback