AR SB405 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Notification that SB405 is now Act 916
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Notification that SB405 is now Act 916
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish John R. "johnny" Cash Day.
Title
To Establish John R. "johnny" Cash Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Trent Garner [R] | Rep. Johnny Rye [R] | Rep. Jeff Wardlaw [R] | Sen. Ben Gilmore [R] |
Sen. David Wallace [R] | Sen. Clarke Tucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Notification that SB405 is now Act 916 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-19 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-15 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-04-15 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-04-06 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed |