AR SB401 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Notification that SB401 is now Act 392
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Notification that SB401 is now Act 392
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
The Liza Fletcher Act.
Title
The Liza Fletcher Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Leding [D] | Rep. Carlton Wing [R] | Rep. Ashley Hudson [D] | Rep. Mark Berry [R] |
Rep. Danny Watson [R] | Sen. Gary Stubblefield [R] | Sen. Stephanie Flowers [D] | Sen. Ricky Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | Senate | Notification that SB401 is now Act 392 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2023-03-28 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2023-03-28 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-03-16 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-03-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-03-14 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Filed |