AR SB400 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Notification that SB400 is now Act 495
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning Firearm Noise Suppressors; And Concerning Compliance With The National Firearms Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning Firearm Noise Suppressors; And Concerning Compliance With The National Firearms Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 75 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateNotification that SB400 is now Act 495
2019-03-14SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-14SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-13SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-13SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-13HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-03-13HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-12HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-06HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-06HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-06SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-06SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-05SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-27SenateRe-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-27SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-27SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-27SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-02-25SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-25SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback