AR SB4 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly 1st Special

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Notification that SB4 is now Act 6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning The Offenses Of Driving While Intoxicated, Underage Driving Under The Influence, Driving Or Boating While Intoxicated, And Driving Or Boating Under The Influence While Underage; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning The Offenses Of Driving While Intoxicated, Underage Driving Under The Influence, Driving Or Boating While Intoxicated, And Driving Or Boating Under The Influence While Underage; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-29SenateNotification that SB4 is now Act 6
2015-05-28SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2015-05-28SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2015-05-28SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2015-05-28SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2015-05-28HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2015-05-28HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-05-28HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-05-27HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2015-05-27HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2015-05-27HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2015-05-27SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2015-05-27SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-05-27SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-05-27SenateRules suspended.
2015-05-27SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-05-27SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2015-05-27SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2015-05-27SenateRules suspended.
2015-05-27SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2015-05-26SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2015-05-26SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback