AR SB396 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Notification that SB396 is now Act 696
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Statutes Concerning The Books And Records Requirements Under The Arkansas Insurance Code; And To Modify The Trade Practices Act Under The Arkansas Insurance Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Statutes Concerning The Books And Records Requirements Under The Arkansas Insurance Code; And To Modify The Trade Practices Act Under The Arkansas Insurance Code.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05SenateNotification that SB396 is now Act 696
2019-04-02SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-01SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-01SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-01SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-28HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-03-28HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-27HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-20HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2019-03-20HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-20SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-20SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-19SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-04SenateRe-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-03-04SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-04SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-04SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-02-21SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-02-21SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback