AR SB393 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Notification that SB393 is now Act 513
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Requirements For Registration Under The Appraisal Management Company Registration Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Requirements For Registration Under The Appraisal Management Company Registration Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateNotification that SB393 is now Act 513
2019-03-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-18SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-14SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-14SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-14HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-03-14HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-13HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-06HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2019-03-06HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-06SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-06SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-05SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-21SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-02-21SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback