AR SB392 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Notification that SB392 is now Act 728
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Repeal The Exemption To Certain Laws For School Districts That Recognize In Their Policies Organizations That Represent Teachers In The School District For The Purpose Of Negotiating Educational Matters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Repeal The Exemption To Certain Laws For School Districts That Recognize In Their Policies Organizations That Represent Teachers In The School District For The Purpose Of Negotiating Educational Matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateNotification that SB392 is now Act 728
2019-04-02SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-01SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-01SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-01SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-28HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-03-28HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-26HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-25HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-25HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-25SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-25SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-20SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-28SenateRe-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-28SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-28SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-28SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-02-21SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-21SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback