AR SB389 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Require A Public School To Provide To Parents And Legal Guardians Prior Written Notification Of And An Opportunity To Inspect Materials Related To Sex Education, Sexual Orientation, And Gender Identity.
Title
To Require A Public School To Provide To Parents And Legal Guardians Prior Written Notification Of And An Opportunity To Inspect Materials Related To Sex Education, Sexual Orientation, And Gender Identity.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Ballinger [R] | Rep. Mary Bentley [R] | Rep. Justin Gonzales [R] | Rep. Aaron Pilkington [R] |
Sen. Charles Beckham [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-03-31 | House | Returned |
2021-03-31 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-16 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-16 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-15 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-09 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed |