AR SB388 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Notification that SB388 is now Act 949
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Notification that SB388 is now Act 949
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Modify Laws Concerning Abortion Clinics.
Title
To Modify Laws Concerning Abortion Clinics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Notification that SB388 is now Act 949 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-04-07 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-23 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-08 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed |