AR SB388 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Notification that SB388 is now Act 650
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning Bicycle Safety; To Allow Bicyclists To Yield At Stop Signs And Red Lights Under Certain Circumstances; And To Amend The Law Concerning The Use Of Bicycles, Electric Bicycles, And Animals On Public Roads.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning Bicycle Safety; To Allow Bicyclists To Yield At Stop Signs And Red Lights Under Certain Circumstances; And To Amend The Law Concerning The Use Of Bicycles, Electric Bicycles, And Animals On Public Roads.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 75 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateNotification that SB388 is now Act 650
2019-03-28SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-28SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-27SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-27SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-27SenateRules suspended.
2019-03-27SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-20SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2019-03-20HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-03-20HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-19HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-19HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-19HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-12HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-11HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
2019-03-11HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-11SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-11SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-07SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-07SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-06SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-02-19SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2019-02-19SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback