AR SB387 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Notification that SB387 is now Act 637
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Authorize Off-label Use Of Drug Treatments To Treat Medicaid Beneficiaries With Pediatric Acute-onset Neuropsychiatric Syndrome And Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders Associated With Streptococcal Infection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Authorize Off-label Use Of Drug Treatments To Treat Medicaid Beneficiaries With Pediatric Acute-onset Neuropsychiatric Syndrome And Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders Associated With Streptococcal Infection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateNotification that SB387 is now Act 637
2021-04-07SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-04-07SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-04-06SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-04-06SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-04-06HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-04-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-01HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-03-11HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-03-11HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-03-11SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-03-11SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-10SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-03-09SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-09SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-09SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-09SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2021-02-24SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-02-24SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback