AR SB386 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Notification that SB386 is now Act 605
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Notification that SB386 is now Act 605
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Retail Water Providers And Related Service.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Retail Water Providers And Related Service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Notification that SB386 is now Act 605 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 and 2 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 and 2 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 and #2 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed as amended, #1 and #2 |
2021-03-18 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 2 |
2021-03-18 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-17 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-11 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-11 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-11 | House | Amendment No. 1 & 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-11 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-03-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-04 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed |