AR SB385 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Notification that SB385 is now Act 298
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Require A Study And Annual Review Of The Functions And Processes Of The Arkansas Department Of Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require A Study And Annual Review Of The Functions And Processes Of The Arkansas Department Of Transportation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateNotification that SB385 is now Act 298
2019-03-04SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-04SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-02-28SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-02-28SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-02-28HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-02-28HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-26HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-25HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
2019-02-25HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-02-25SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-02-25SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-21SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-19SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2019-02-19SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback