AR SB381 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Notification that SB381 is now Act 557
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Prohibit The Use Of Corporal Punishment On A Child With A Disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Prohibit The Use Of Corporal Punishment On A Child With A Disability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateNotification that SB381 is now Act 557
2019-03-25SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-25SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-20SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-20SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-20HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-03-20HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-19HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-14HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-14SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-14SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-13SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-07SenateRe-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-07SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-07SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-07SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2019-02-20SenateRe-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-20SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-20SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-20SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-02-19SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-19SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback