AR SB381 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Notification that SB381 is now Act 335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Notification that SB381 is now Act 335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Finance And Administration - Management Services Division Reappropriation.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Finance And Administration - Management Services Division Reappropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Senate | Notification that SB381 is now Act 335 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-02-28 | House | Returned To Senate as Passed. |
2017-02-28 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-02-28 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-28 | House | Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. |
2017-02-28 | House | RULES SUSPENDED |
2017-02-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2017-02-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Filed |