AR SB380 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Notification that SB380 is now Act 477
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Modify Coverage For Screening Mammography And Breast Ultrasound For The Diagnosis Of Breast Disease Such As Cancer And For The Evaluation Of Dense Breast Tissue As An Essential Health Benefit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Modify Coverage For Screening Mammography And Breast Ultrasound For The Diagnosis Of Breast Disease Such As Cancer And For The Evaluation Of Dense Breast Tissue As An Essential Health Benefit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateNotification that SB380 is now Act 477
2019-03-14SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-14SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-13SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-13SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-13HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-03-13HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-12HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-27HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-27HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-02-27SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-02-27SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-26SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-25SenateRe-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-02-25SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-25SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-25SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-02-19SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-02-19SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback