AR SB379 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Notification that SB379 is now Act 403
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Notification that SB379 is now Act 403
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Process For Emergency Declarations And Directives Addressing A Statewide State Of Disaster Emergency Related To Public Health; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
Concerning The Process For Emergency Declarations And Directives Addressing A Statewide State Of Disaster Emergency Related To Public Health; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | Notification that SB379 is now Act 403 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-03-15 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-15 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-03-15 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-11 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-04 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed |