AR SB375 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Notification that SB375 is now Act 627
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Notification that SB375 is now Act 627
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Court Reports That Are Required Under The Arkansas Juvenile Code Of 1989.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Court Reports That Are Required Under The Arkansas Juvenile Code Of 1989.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Notification that SB375 is now Act 627 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-03-27 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-19 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-03-19 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Filed |