AR SB374 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Notification that SB374 is now Act 807
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Penalties Related To Administrative Inspection Warrants Executed By The Arkansas Department Of Environmental Quality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Penalties Related To Administrative Inspection Warrants Executed By The Arkansas Department Of Environmental Quality.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateNotification that SB374 is now Act 807
2019-04-04SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-04SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-03SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-03SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-04-03HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-04-03HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-28HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-19HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-19HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-19SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-19SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-18SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-18SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-18SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-14SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-02-18SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-02-18SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback