AR SB372 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Notification that SB372 is now Act 393
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Make Technical Corrections To Title 26 Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Make Technical Corrections To Title 26 Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Taxation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateNotification that SB372 is now Act 393
2019-03-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-06SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-05SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-05SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-05HouseReturned To Senate as Passed.
2019-03-05HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-05HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-05HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2019-03-05HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2019-02-28HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-27HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-27HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-02-27SenateOrdered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-02-27SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-26SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-18SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-02-18SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback