AR SB367 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Accounting Practices In Circuit Court And The Office Of A Circuit Court Clerk; And To Create The Circuit Court Accounting And Fine Collection Committee.
Title
Concerning Accounting Practices In Circuit Court And The Office Of A Circuit Court Clerk; And To Create The Circuit Court Accounting And Fine Collection Committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan King [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died in House at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-04-03 | House | The vote by which SB367 failed to pass, Failed to be expunged. |
2017-03-21 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-20 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-20 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-20 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-16 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2017-03-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-07 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Filed |