AR SB365 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB365 is now Act 1406
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend Act 3 Of The Regular Session Of 2013, The General Appropriation Act For The Ordinary Expenses Of The Executive, Judicial And Legislative Branches For The 2013-2014 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Act 3 Of The Regular Session Of 2013, The General Appropriation Act For The Ordinary Expenses Of The Executive, Judicial And Legislative Branches For The 2013-2014 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateNotification that SB365 is now Act 1406
2013-04-22SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-22SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-19SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-19SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2013-04-19HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2013-04-19HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-04-19HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-18HouseRead the third time and failed.
2013-04-18HouseRead the third time and failed.
2013-04-17HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2013-04-17HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-04-17SenateOrdered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-04-17SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-04-17SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-17SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-17SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-04-17SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-02-19SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2013-02-19SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback