AR SB364 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB364 is now Act 1519
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB364 is now Act 1519
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
The Distribution Of The Eighty-ninth Session Projects Account Of The General Improvement Fund To Provide Additional Funds For The State Budget.
Title
The Distribution Of The Eighty-ninth Session Projects Account Of The General Improvement Fund To Provide Additional Funds For The State Budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | Notification that SB364 is now Act 1519 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-04-23 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-23 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-04-23 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2013-04-22 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Filed |