AR SB362 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Notification that SB362 is now Act 465
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Notification that SB362 is now Act 465
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Sunset Certain Tax Incentives; To Amend The Law Concerning The Sales And Use Tax Refund For The Repair And Partial Replacement Of Manufacturing Machinery And Equipment; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Sunset Certain Tax Incentives; To Amend The Law Concerning The Sales And Use Tax Refund For The Repair And Partial Replacement Of Manufacturing Machinery And Equipment; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Notification that SB362 is now Act 465 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-03-07 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-07 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-03-07 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2017-02-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Filed |