AR SB357 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Notification that SB357 is now Act 469
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Enact The State Insurance Department's General Omnibus Bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Enact The State Insurance Department's General Omnibus Bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-19SenateNotification that SB357 is now Act 469
2023-03-31SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2023-03-31SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2023-03-31SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2023-03-31SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2023-03-30HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2023-03-30HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-03-29HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-03-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2023-03-09HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2023-03-09SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2023-03-09SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-03-08SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-03-02SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2023-03-02SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback