AR SB357 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Notification that SB357 is now Act 433
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Notification that SB357 is now Act 433
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing A Statute Prohibiting The Possession Of A Firearm In Certain Locations; And Making Technical Corrections.
Title
Repealing A Statute Prohibiting The Possession Of A Firearm In Certain Locations; And Making Technical Corrections.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Ballinger [R] | Sen. Justin Boyd [R] | Rep. Cindy Crawford [R] | Rep. Justin Gonzales [R] |
Sen. Jim Dotson [R] | Rep. Aaron Pilkington [R] | Sen. Trent Garner [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Notification that SB357 is now Act 433 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-03-22 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-22 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-18 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-04 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed |