AR SB354 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Notification that SB354 is now Act 461
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Fairness In Women's Sports Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Fairness In Women's Sports Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateNotification that SB354 is now Act 461
2021-03-23SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-03-23SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-03-22SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-03-22SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-03-22HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-03-22HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-18HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-03-10HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-03-10HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-03-10SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-03-10SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-09SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-09SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-09SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-03-08SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2021-02-23SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-02-23SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback