AR SB354 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Notification that SB354 is now Act 968
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Notification that SB354 is now Act 968
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Authorize Elevator Safety Tests To Be Witnessed By Private Sector Licensed Inspectors; To Eliminate The Semi-annual Inspections; And To Improve Enforcement Of Elevator Safety Laws.
Title
To Authorize Elevator Safety Tests To Be Witnessed By Private Sector Licensed Inspectors; To Eliminate The Semi-annual Inspections; And To Improve Enforcement Of Elevator Safety Laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Notification that SB354 is now Act 968 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-29 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-15 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-15 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-03-07 | Senate | The vote by which SB 354 FAILED of adoption was EXPUNGED. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Filed |