AR SB354 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Notification that SB354 is now Act 386
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Notification that SB354 is now Act 386
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Firefighter Special License Plates; To Remove The Limitation On The Issuance Of Firefighter License Plates; And To Redirect The Remittance Of The Additional Monthly Fee.
Title
Concerning Firefighter Special License Plates; To Remove The Limitation On The Issuance Of Firefighter License Plates; And To Redirect The Remittance Of The Additional Monthly Fee.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Sample [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Notification that SB354 is now Act 386 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-03-10 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-03-10 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2015-02-26 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed |