AR SB351 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Notification that SB351 is now Act 972
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Notification that SB351 is now Act 972
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Laws Regarding Cosmetology Instructor Training.
Title
To Amend The Laws Regarding Cosmetology Instructor Training.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Sample [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 67 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Notification that SB351 is now Act 972 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-29 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-21 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-21 | House | Notification from the Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor, that on SB351 a motion was made to expunge the "Do Not Pass" motion previously made and carried on SB351. |
2017-03-16 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do not pass. |
2017-03-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-02 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Filed |