AR SB349 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Require The Department Of Education To Provide Certain Levels Of Support To Certain Public School Districts Based On Reading Scores; And To Amend The Purposes On Which National School Lunch State Categorical Funds May Be Spent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require The Department Of Education To Provide Certain Levels Of Support To Certain Public School Districts Based On Reading Scores; And To Amend The Purposes On Which National School Lunch State Categorical Funds May Be Spent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateRecommended for study in the Interim Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-04-24SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-04-24SenateDied in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2019-04-24SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-24HouseReturned to the Senate.
2019-04-24HouseDied on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
2019-03-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-26HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-26SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-26SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-25SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-25SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-25SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-20SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-02-18SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-18SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback