AR SB345 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Notification that SB345 is now Act 457
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Notification that SB345 is now Act 457
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Reduce The Credit Available To Offset The Accident And Health Insurance Premium Tax; And To Provide For A Cap On The Credit Available To Offset The Accident And Health Insurance Premium Tax.
Title
To Reduce The Credit Available To Offset The Accident And Health Insurance Premium Tax; And To Provide For A Cap On The Credit Available To Offset The Accident And Health Insurance Premium Tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Hendren [I] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Notification that SB345 is now Act 457 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-03-07 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-07 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2019-02-28 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed |