AR SB343 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Summary
To Prevent Election Misconduct; To Amend The Law Concerning Absentee Ballots, Assistants, Designated Bearers, And Administrators; And To Clarify The Procedures For Casting And Counting Of Absentee Ballots.
Title
To Prevent Election Misconduct; To Amend The Law Concerning Absentee Ballots, Assistants, Designated Bearers, And Administrators; And To Clarify The Procedures For Casting And Counting Of Absentee Ballots.
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Ingram [D] | Rep. Mary L. Slinkard [R] | Rep. Deborah Ferguson [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Sen. Bruce Maloch [D] | Sen. Robert Thompson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-18 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Amendment # 5 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 5 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-13 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Amendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 4 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-12 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-04 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Amendment # 1 and 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 and 2 |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB343 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/SB343.pdf |