AR SB340 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Notification that SB340 is now Act 690
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Laws Concerning Consent To Medical Treatment To Authorize A Liaison Under The Federal Mckinney-vento Homeless Assistance Act To Consent To Medical Treatment For A Homeless Minor; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Laws Concerning Consent To Medical Treatment To Authorize A Liaison Under The Federal Mckinney-vento Homeless Assistance Act To Consent To Medical Treatment For A Homeless Minor; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05SenateNotification that SB340 is now Act 690
2019-04-02SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-02SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-28SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-28SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-28SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-28SenateRules suspended.
2019-03-28SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2019-03-28SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-27SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2019-03-18SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-18SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2019-03-18HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-03-18HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-18HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-14HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-14HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-14HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-12HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-02-21HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-21HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-02-21SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-02-21SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-02-21SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-20SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-14SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-14SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback