AR SB340 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Notification that SB340 is now Act 425
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Division Of Developmental Disabilities Services - Human Development Center Grants General Improvement Appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Division Of Developmental Disabilities Services - Human Development Center Grants General Improvement Appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 80 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-17SenateNotification that SB340 is now Act 425
2015-03-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2015-03-12SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2015-03-11SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2015-03-11SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2015-03-11HouseReturned To Senate as Passed.
2015-03-11HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-03-11HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-03-11HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2015-03-11HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2015-03-03HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2015-03-02HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2015-03-02SenateOrdered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2015-03-02SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-03-02SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-02-26SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2015-02-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2015-02-11SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback