AR SB340 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Notification that SB340 is now Act 554
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Guaranteed Energy Cost Savings Act And To Allow State Agencies To Use Maintenance And Operations Appropriations For Debt Service Related To A Guaranteed Energy Cost Savings Contract.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Guaranteed Energy Cost Savings Act And To Allow State Agencies To Use Maintenance And Operations Appropriations For Debt Service Related To A Guaranteed Energy Cost Savings Contract.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-01SenateNotification that SB340 is now Act 554
2013-03-27SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-03-27SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-03-26SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-03-26SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2013-03-26HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2013-03-26HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-03-20HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-03-11HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2013-03-11HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-03-11SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-03-11SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-03-05SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-03-05SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2013-02-28SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2013-02-14SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2013-02-14SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback