AR SB333 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Notification that SB333 is now Act 538
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Notification that SB333 is now Act 538
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Lawful Display Of A License Plate; And To Create An Exception Allowing Certain Devices To Obscure A License Plate.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Lawful Display Of A License Plate; And To Create An Exception Allowing Certain Devices To Obscure A License Plate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 83 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Senate | Notification that SB333 is now Act 538 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2021-03-18 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-18 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-17 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-16 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-03-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2021-03-01 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed |